Here are a number of videos to show you different methods for multiplication. Some show you how to multiply by a 1-digit number whilst others show you how to multiply by a 2-digit number. Enjoy and feel free to post any questions. Practise your preferred methods with these questions:

35 x 6, 162 x 4, 83 x 5, 619 x 7, 118 x 3, 34 x 27, 173 x 23

https://youtu.be/cBe3RYJRODk – Short multiplication method – 2-digit x 1-digit multiplication (53 x 6)

https://www.youtube.com/embed/NzxfMxkXRfQ – Grid method for 2-digit x 1-digit multiplication (38 x 7)

https://www.youtube.com/embed/xTf8kHaOilY – Short multiplication method – 3-digit x 1-digit multiplication (714 x 5)

https://www.youtube.com/embed/XZJ3pV3vHcQ – Short multiplication – 3-digit x 1-digit multiplication (325 x 5)

https://www.youtube.com/embed/joSEl7f4yiM – Long multiplication method – 2-digit x 2-digit multiplication (72 x 35)

https://www.youtube.com/embed/3xDJDFmDrlg – Grid method for 2-digit x 2-digit multiplication (31 x 26)

Good luck!

I have done these questions in my learning log. 😄

1) 35 x 6 = 180

2) 162 x 4 = 648

3) 83 x 5 = 415

4) 169 x 7 = 1112

5) 118 x 3 = 354

ive done these coalculations

ive done these sums

Tell me the hardest question you can give me for multiplication!!!

What would you say is a hard question? Can you do 286 x 73?

ANSWERS

1.35×6=210

2.162×4=648

3.83×5=415

4.619×7=4,333

5.118×3=354

6.34×27=918

7.173×23=3,979